Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 45 Today
» 1352 Yesterday
» 7786 Week
» 28228 Month
» 365074 Year
» 1586639 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #29531
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 109
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
V2 60931   15/03/1952
V2 60927   09/01/1954
V2 60901   10/05/1956
V2 60810   08/03/1958
V2 60824   18/03/1960
V2 60970   29/01/1964