Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 151 Today
» 1272 Yesterday
» 6540 Week
» 26982 Month
» 363828 Year
» 1585393 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #29413
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 109
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
V2 60818   12/06/1952
V2 60910   10/04/1954
V2 60973   06/07/1957
V2 60868   27/09/1962