Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 150 Today
» 1272 Yesterday
» 6539 Week
» 26981 Month
» 363827 Year
» 1585392 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #3099/29477
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 109
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
V2 4865   20/01/1940
V2 4790   12/10/1944
V2 969   18/09/1946
V2 60973   09/04/1949
V2 60822   30/08/1952
V2 60960   05/11/1954
V2 60833   27/11/1956
V2 60888   18/11/1958
V2 60856   05/01/1961