Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 74 Today
» 1352 Yesterday
» 7815 Week
» 28257 Month
» 365103 Year
» 1586668 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #9238/29507
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 109
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
V2 4791   11/07/1942
V2 4888   25/05/1946
V2 60949   20/08/1949
V2 60886   21/03/1953
V2 60824   11/03/1955
V2 60801   07/12/1956