Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 26 Online
» 1023 Today
» 1282 Yesterday
» 7413 Week
» 36911 Month
» 373757 Year
» 1595322 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #3101/29497
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 109
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
V2 4866   26/01/1940
V2 4856   22/10/1941
V2 4819   04/05/1944
V2 3665   01/02/1946
V2 973   17/10/1947
V2 60825   09/08/1949
V2 60969   18/07/1953
V2 60823   23/07/1955
V2 60957   22/06/1957