Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 199 Today
» 1354 Yesterday
» 4445 Week
» 1553 Month
» 108499 Year
» 1330064 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #3131/29448
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 109
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
V2 4878   19/04/1940
V2 4818 ST. PETER'S SCHOOL 07/03/1942
V2 4872   01/04/1944
V2 833   20/12/1947
V2 60947   19/11/1949
V2 60814   26/04/1952
V2 60815   20/09/1955
V2 60824   10/05/1963