Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 1315 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19118 Week
» 72134 Month
» 191661 Year
» 3218514 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Boiler #29351
Big Four Company |
LNER |
Diagram |
109 |
Firebox Type |
Belpaire |
|
Boiler History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
V2 |
60902 |
|
23/02/1951 |
V2 |
60903 |
|
02/11/1953 |
V2 |
60936 |
|
18/07/1955 |
V2 |
60835 |
THE GREEN HOWARD |
12/02/1958 |
V2 |
60963 |
|
09/02/1960 |
|