Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 138 Today
» 1272 Yesterday
» 6527 Week
» 26969 Month
» 363815 Year
» 1585380 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #29466
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 109
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
V2 60838   19/05/1951
V2 60970   08/07/1955
V2 60919   16/08/1957
V2 60938   10/07/1959
V2 60973   23/01/1965