Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 131 Today
» 1272 Yesterday
» 6520 Week
» 26962 Month
» 363808 Year
» 1585373 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #9167/29349
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 109
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
V2 4845   27/06/1939
V2 892   24/08/1946
V2 60846   12/01/1949
A2 60510 ROBERT THE BRUCE 20/05/1953
A2 60509 WAVERLEY 18/12/1958