Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 20 Online
» 537 Today
» 1315 Yesterday
» 537 Week
» 30035 Month
» 366881 Year
» 1588446 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #29548
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 109
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
V2 60973   05/07/1952
V2 60977   21/12/1955
V2 60912   10/06/1958
V2 60977   16/09/1960
V2 60865   07/06/1962