Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 148 Today
» 1272 Yesterday
» 6537 Week
» 26979 Month
» 363825 Year
» 1585390 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #29459
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 109
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
V2 60960   07/02/1951
V2 60972   21/02/1953
V2 60973   28/10/1955
V2 60959   28/09/1957
V2 60874   17/09/1959