Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 25 Online
» 1347 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19150 Week
» 72166 Month
» 191693 Year
» 3218546 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Boiler #9229/29495
Big Four Company |
LNER |
Diagram |
109 |
Firebox Type |
Belpaire |
|
Boiler History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
V2 |
3656 |
|
25/06/1941 |
V2 |
4890 |
|
15/07/1943 |
V2 |
60969 |
|
06/01/1949 |
V2 |
60967 |
|
05/09/1953 |
V2 |
60969 |
|
23/06/1955 |
V2 |
60822 |
|
19/06/1957 |
V2 |
60961 |
|
31/12/1959 |
|