Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 5 Today
» 875 Yesterday
» 5349 Week
» 6239 Month
» 314220 Year
» 1198601 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #571
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 13
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
B3 6165 VALOUR 07/11/1931
B7 5472   24/06/1933
B3 6166 EARL HAIG 07/04/1934
B7 5459   05/10/1935
B8 5004 GLENALMOND 25/09/1937
B19 5427   12/10/1940
B19 5423 SIR SAM FAY 03/04/1943
B7 5467   09/06/1945
B7 1380   05/04/1947