Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 78 Today
» 1224 Yesterday
» 3890 Week
» 33388 Month
» 370234 Year
» 1591799 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #7690
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 2
Firebox Type Round Top
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O2 489   14/11/1923
O3 3456   05/11/1932
O3 3474   23/02/1935
O3 3465   19/03/1938