Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 102 Today
» 1296 Yesterday
» 5210 Week
» 34708 Month
» 371554 Year
» 1593119 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #4404
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 2
Firebox Type Round Top
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O2 2434   20/01/1934
O2 3495   15/01/1938
O3 3471   15/06/1940
O3 3460   25/05/1945
O3 3475   04/11/1949