Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 21 Online
» 1028 Today
» 1282 Yesterday
» 7418 Week
» 36916 Month
» 373762 Year
» 1595327 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #8857
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 2
Firebox Type Round Top
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O3 3457   29/02/1936
O2 3489   02/07/1938
O3 3467   22/01/1942
O2 3942   21/09/1946