Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 102 Today
» 1296 Yesterday
» 5210 Week
» 34708 Month
» 371554 Year
» 1593119 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #8856
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 2
Firebox Type Round Top
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O2 3486   07/03/1936
O3 3475   21/06/1943
O2 3936   12/10/1946
O3 63477   26/08/1949