Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 1041 Today
» 1282 Yesterday
» 7431 Week
» 36929 Month
» 373775 Year
» 1595340 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #7712
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 2
Firebox Type Round Top
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O2 3498   29/03/1924
O2 3478   05/05/1934
O2 3490   27/08/1938
O3 3463   08/02/1942