Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 113 Today
» 1296 Yesterday
» 5221 Week
» 34719 Month
» 371565 Year
» 1593130 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #8458
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 2
Firebox Type Round Top
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O2 2956   28/05/1932
O2 2958   02/10/1936
O3 3472   16/05/1943
O2 3929   03/12/1947
O3 3481   28/01/1949