Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 100 Today
» 1296 Yesterday
» 5208 Week
» 34706 Month
» 371552 Year
» 1593117 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #8855
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 2
Firebox Type Round Top
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O2 3461   02/11/1935
O3 3465   13/04/1940
O2 2960   07/11/1942
O2 63945   25/10/1948
O2 63982   15/05/1950