Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 1036 Today
» 1282 Yesterday
» 7426 Week
» 36924 Month
» 373770 Year
» 1595335 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #21007
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 2
Firebox Type Round Top
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O3 63484   17/11/1950
O2 63951   21/11/1953
O2 63973   11/02/1956
O2 63951   02/09/1958