Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 25 Online
» 536 Today
» 1249 Yesterday
» 1785 Week
» 22227 Month
» 359073 Year
» 1580638 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #8976
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 2
Firebox Type Round Top
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O2 2960   17/09/1936
O2 2434   03/06/1938
O3 3467   29/07/1944
O2 3943   17/08/1946
O2 3968   16/07/1948