Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 116 Today
» 1296 Yesterday
» 5224 Week
» 34722 Month
» 371568 Year
» 1593133 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #8186
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 2
Firebox Type Round Top
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O3 3471   30/09/1932
O2 3488   01/10/1938
O2 3487   12/10/1940
O3 3469   03/02/1943
O2 3930   29/04/1948