Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 117 Today
» 1296 Yesterday
» 5225 Week
» 34723 Month
» 371569 Year
» 1593134 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #8182
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 2
Firebox Type Round Top
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O2 3490   29/10/1932
O3 3472   29/09/1938
O2 3491   20/06/1942
O3 3493   22/07/1948