Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 29 Online
» 1021 Today
» 1282 Yesterday
» 7411 Week
» 36909 Month
» 373755 Year
» 1595320 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #7707
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 2
Firebox Type Round Top
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O2 493   22/12/1923
O2 3477   31/03/1934
O3 3473   03/08/1938
O2 3488   31/08/1940