Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 1101 Today
» 1282 Yesterday
» 7491 Week
» 36989 Month
» 373835 Year
» 1595400 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #8460
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 2
Firebox Type Round Top
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O2 2958   07/07/1932
O2 2434   13/07/1937
O2 2432   05/11/1938
O3 3473   14/08/1940