Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 95 Today
» 1296 Yesterday
» 5203 Week
» 34701 Month
» 371547 Year
» 1593112 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #9013
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 2
Firebox Type Round Top
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O2 2959   02/10/1937
O3 3474   06/05/1944
O2 3958   30/04/1948
O2 63974   22/06/1949