Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 1002 Today
» 1260 Yesterday
» 4601 Week
» 10735 Month
» 238619 Year
» 1460184 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #21008
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 2
Firebox Type Round Top
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O2 63953   28/11/1950
O2 63971   29/05/1953
O2 63931   03/06/1955
O2 63963   20/02/1958
O2 63967   03/07/1961