Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 143 Today
» 1034 Yesterday
» 1177 Week
» 23683 Month
» 326873 Year
» 1548438 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #801
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 16Sup
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
B4 6095   08/10/1927
B4 6098   09/07/1932
B4 6099   31/12/1936
B4 6100   17/08/1940
B4 6099   12/06/1943
B4 6104   20/01/1945