Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 20 Online
» 432 Today
» 1031 Yesterday
» 7439 Week
» 13573 Month
» 241457 Year
» 1463022 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #922
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 16Sup
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
B4 6098   06/10/1928
B4 6096   13/08/1932
B4 6095   26/01/1935
B4 6104   09/05/1936
B4 6098   20/09/1941
B4 6097 IMMINGHAM 11/11/1944