Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 584 Today
» 862 Yesterday
» 4132 Week
» 5022 Month
» 313003 Year
» 1197384 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #55
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 16Sup
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
B4 6102   21/11/1931
B4 6097 IMMINGHAM 09/12/1933
B4 6095   25/04/1936
B4 6098   29/01/1938
B4 6101   11/04/1942
B4 6096   21/07/1945