Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 21 Online
» 20 Today
» 1086 Yesterday
» 6327 Week
» 21441 Month
» 324631 Year
» 1546196 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #802
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 16Sup
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
B4 6096   19/11/1927
B4 6097 IMMINGHAM 24/09/1932
B4 6100   23/06/1934
B4 6097 IMMINGHAM 10/08/1940
B4 6100   27/03/1943