Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 20 Online
» 921 Today
» 1260 Yesterday
» 4520 Week
» 10654 Month
» 238538 Year
» 1460103 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #132
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 16Sup
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
B4 6097 IMMINGHAM 14/03/1931
B4 6104   26/11/1932
B4 6096   15/09/1934
B4 6098   19/12/1936
B4 6100   02/07/1938
B4 6097 IMMINGHAM 17/10/1942
B4 6101   30/12/1944