Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 1029 Today
» 1053 Yesterday
» 6250 Week
» 21364 Month
» 324554 Year
» 1546119 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #681
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 16Sup
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
B4 6100   01/03/1930
B4 6104   04/08/1934
B4 6096   31/10/1936
B4 6102   30/09/1944