Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 21 Online
» 549 Today
» 1099 Yesterday
» 1648 Week
» 7782 Month
» 235666 Year
» 1457231 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #923
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 16Sup
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
B4 6104   10/11/1928
B4 6099   08/04/1933
B4 6097 IMMINGHAM 24/08/1935
B4 6096   30/11/1940
B4 6104   06/02/1943
B4 6100   10/11/1945