Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 155 Today
» 1053 Yesterday
» 5376 Week
» 20490 Month
» 323680 Year
» 1545245 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #127
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 16Sup
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
B4 6101   16/12/1933
B4 6100   31/10/1936
B4 6101   15/10/1938
B4 6096   17/10/1942
B4 6098   29/09/1945