Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 27 Online
» 3400 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16806 Week
» 69822 Month
» 189349 Year
» 3216202 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Boiler #28808
Big Four Company |
LNER |
Diagram |
100A |
|
Boiler History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
B1 |
61152 |
|
10/03/1951 |
B1 |
61141 |
|
04/04/1953 |
B1 |
61177 |
|
31/03/1955 |
B1 |
61192 |
|
13/04/1957 |
B1 |
61003 |
GAZELLE |
30/01/1959 |
B1 |
61059 |
|
03/07/1962 |
|