Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 573 Today
» 908 Yesterday
» 3162 Week
» 25204 Month
» 131518 Year
» 642620 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #28216
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 100A
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
B1 61017 BUSHBUCK 22/06/1951
B1 61034 CHIRU 01/09/1953
B1 61138   14/03/1956
B1 61012 PUKU 05/12/1958
B1 61062   31/08/1961