Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 98 Today
» 1091 Yesterday
» 7552 Week
» 10134 Month
» 274767 Year
» 1496332 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #28815
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 100A
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
B1 61179   27/10/1951
B1 61024 ADDAX 21/11/1953
B1 61368   28/03/1956
B1 61353   30/01/1959
B1 61240 HARRY HINCHLIFFE 28/03/1962