Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 56 Today
» 1091 Yesterday
» 7510 Week
» 10092 Month
» 274725 Year
» 1496290 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #28800
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 100A
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
B1 61195   02/12/1950
B1 61153   13/09/1952
B1 61169   07/08/1954
B1 61269   19/06/1956
B1 61368   19/11/1958
B1 61029 CHAMOIS 24/08/1963