Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 91 Today
» 1085 Yesterday
» 6147 Week
» 20724 Month
» 383969 Year
» 460556 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #28220
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 100A
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
B1 61034 CHIRU 27/06/1951
B1 61100   03/04/1954
B1 61061   04/11/1955
B1 61044   08/08/1958
B1 61066   08/04/1961