Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 72 Today
» 906 Yesterday
» 5174 Week
» 21825 Month
» 215669 Year
» 726771 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #28168
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 100A
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
B1 61051   17/01/1952
B1 61150   16/01/1954
B1 61034 CHIRU 11/01/1956
B1 61124   01/02/1958