Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 573 Today
» 908 Yesterday
» 3162 Week
» 25204 Month
» 131518 Year
» 642620 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #28398
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 100A
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
B1 61315   13/02/1954
B1 61189 SIR WILLIAM GRAY 24/11/1955
B1 61271   23/09/1958
B1 61034 CHIRU 25/01/1961