Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 1054 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18857 Week
» 71873 Month
» 191400 Year
» 3218253 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Boiler #28100
Big Four Company |
LNER |
Diagram |
100A |
|
Boiler History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
B1 |
61087 |
|
19/09/1950 |
B1 |
61142 |
|
04/07/1952 |
B1 |
61036 |
RALPH ASSHETON |
01/01/1954 |
B1 |
61083 |
|
07/07/1956 |
B1 |
61286 |
|
04/09/1958 |
B1 |
61200 |
|
20/07/1960 |
|