Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 106 Today
» 1091 Yesterday
» 7560 Week
» 10142 Month
» 274775 Year
» 1496340 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #28236
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 100A
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
B1 61368   22/11/1951
B1 61158   09/04/1953
B1 61116   01/10/1955
B1 61095   05/07/1957
B1 61391   28/08/1959