Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 1022 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18825 Week
» 71841 Month
» 191368 Year
» 3218221 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Boiler #9866/28187
Big Four Company |
LNER |
Diagram |
100A |
|
Boiler History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
B1 |
1229 |
|
02/09/1947 |
B1 |
61033 |
DIBATAG |
17/01/1950 |
B1 |
61063 |
|
03/04/1954 |
B1 |
61169 |
|
18/04/1956 |
B1 |
61289 |
|
25/06/1958 |
B1 |
61032 |
STEMBOK |
24/02/1961 |
B1 |
61256 |
|
21/05/1964 |
|