Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 685 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14091 Week
» 67107 Month
» 186634 Year
» 3213487 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Boiler #9648/29804
Big Four Company |
LNER |
Diagram |
118 |
Firebox Type |
Belpaire |
|
Boiler History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
A2 |
528 |
TUDOR MINSTREL |
21/02/1948 |
A1 |
60162 |
SAINT JOHNSTOUN |
24/04/1953 |
A1 |
60122 |
CURLEW |
02/03/1956 |
A1 |
60161 |
NORTH BRITISH |
30/11/1957 |
A2 |
60523 |
SUN CASTLE |
28/11/1959 |
A2 |
60522 |
STRAIGHT DEAL |
14/06/1962 |
|