Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 6 Online
» 343 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18146 Week
» 71162 Month
» 190689 Year
» 3217542 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Boiler #8908
Big Four Company |
LNER |
Diagram |
107 |
Firebox Type |
Belpaire |
|
Boiler History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
A4 |
2512 |
|
18/12/1935 |
A4 |
2510 |
QUICKSILVER |
20/07/1940 |
A4 |
4489 |
DOMINION OF CANADA |
21/02/1942 |
A4 |
60013 |
DOMINION OF NEW ZEALAND |
20/05/1949 |
|