Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 3524 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16930 Week
» 69946 Month
» 189473 Year
» 3216326 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Boiler #3415/28578
Big Four Company |
LNER |
Diagram |
100A |
|
Boiler History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
B1 |
8304 |
GAZELLE |
22/11/1943 |
B1 |
1005 |
BONGO |
01/05/1947 |
B1 |
61008 |
KUDU |
10/06/1950 |
B1 |
61004 |
ORYX |
22/11/1952 |
B1 |
61339 |
|
29/11/1957 |
B1 |
61321 |
|
03/11/1960 |
|