Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 20 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17823 Week
» 70839 Month
» 190366 Year
» 3217219 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Boiler #5059/28262
Big Four Company |
LNER |
Diagram |
100A |
|
Boiler History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
B1 |
1063 |
|
10/08/1946 |
B1 |
61079 |
|
19/04/1948 |
B1 |
61299 |
|
17/12/1949 |
B1 |
61285 |
|
10/04/1952 |
B1 |
61232 |
|
12/06/1954 |
B1 |
61046 |
|
21/06/1957 |
B1 |
61317 |
|
02/10/1959 |
|